AK HB100 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - FN11: (UA)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - FN11: (UA)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to allocations of funding for the Alaska Workforce Investment Board; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Workforce Invest Board Allocations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | FN11: (UA) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN9: (LWF) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN8: (LWF) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN7: (LWF) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69 |
2021-06-28 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21 |
2021-06-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21 |
2021-06-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 4 SLA 21 |
2021-06-09 | House | 4:30 P.M. 6/7/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-19 | House | LETTER OF INTENT WITH S.FIN REPORT |
2021-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: HB 100 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N- A2 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | HUGHES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2021-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- A2 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 100 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | SENATE LETTER OF INTENT ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | FN11: (UA) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | FN10: (LWF) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | FN9: (LWF) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | FN8: (LWF) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | FN7: (LWF) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | FN1: (EED) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | AM: WILSON |
2021-05-17 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, VON IMHOF |
2021-05-17 | Senate | LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT |
2021-05-17 | Senate | FIN RPT 3DP 1AM |
2021-04-30 | Senate | FIN |
2021-04-30 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-28 | House | VERSION: HB 100 |
2021-04-28 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-04-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TUCK |
2021-04-28 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y40 |
2021-04-28 | House | PASSED Y36 N4 |
2021-04-28 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2021-04-28 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y18 N22 |
2021-04-28 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y18 N22 |
2021-04-28 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS 1 & 2 UC |
2021-04-28 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 100 |
2021-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2021-04-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR |
2021-04-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | FN11: (UA) |
2021-04-21 | House | FN10: (LWF) |
2021-04-21 | House | FN9: (LWF) |
2021-04-21 | House | FN8: (LWF) |
2021-04-21 | House | FN7: (LWF) |
2021-04-21 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2021-04-21 | House | CARPENTER, MERRICK, FOSTER |
2021-04-21 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, |
2021-04-21 | House | FIN RPT 11DP |
2021-03-20 | House | FN6: (UA) |
2021-03-20 | House | FN5: (LWF) |
2021-03-20 | House | FN4: (LWF) |
2021-03-20 | House | FN3: (LWF) |
2021-03-20 | House | FN2: (LWF) |
2021-03-20 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2021-03-20 | House | AM: KAUFMAN |
2021-03-20 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, NELSON, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-03-20 | House | L&C RPT 5DP 1AM |
2021-02-18 | House | L&C, FIN |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |