AK HB10 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to mandatory exemptions from municipal property taxes for certain assets of the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority and for property owned by certain private colleges or universities; relating to optional exemptions from municipal property taxes for certain residential property; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Municipal Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/1 CHAPTER 10 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 3:54 PM 4/28/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1 | |
2010-04-18 | TAKE UP CONCUR | |
2010-04-15 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2010-04-15 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 10(FIN) AM S(REENGROSSED) | |
2010-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-15 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-15 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, DYSON | |
2010-04-15 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2010-04-15 | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-15 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM NO 2 UC | |
2010-04-15 | IN THIRD READING SCS CSHB 10(FIN) AM S | |
2010-04-15 | RESCIND PASSING SCS CSHB 10(FIN) AM S UC | |
2010-04-15 | RETURN REQUEST MESSAGE READ & TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-14 | RETURNED TO SENATE PER REQUEST UC | |
2010-04-12 | SENATE MESSAGE REQUESTING RETURN OF BILL | |
2010-04-11 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2010-04-11 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 10(FIN) AM S | |
2010-04-11 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-11 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-11 | PASSED Y19 N- A1 | |
2010-04-11 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, MENARD, EGAN, ELLIS, OLSON, KOOKESH | |
2010-04-11 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 10(FIN) AM S | |
2010-04-11 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-11 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-11 | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-11 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-11 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2010 | |
2010-04-10 | FN2: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-10 | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON | |
2010-04-10 | DP: HOFFMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-04-10 | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 2NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-04-08 | COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN | |
2009-04-08 | COSPONSOR(S): GATTO | |
2009-04-08 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2009-04-08 | DP: OLSON, FRENCH, KOOKESH, MENARD | |
2009-04-08 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 5 | |
2009-04-08 | CRA RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE | |
2009-04-03 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER | |
2009-03-30 | CRA, FIN | |
2009-03-30 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-03-27 | VERSION: CSHB 10(FIN) | |
2009-03-27 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-03-27 | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP | |
2009-03-25 | JOHANSEN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2009-03-25 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-03-25 | PASSED Y31 N6 E3 | |
2009-03-25 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 10(FIN) | |
2009-03-25 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-03-25 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-03-25 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-03-25 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2009-03-18 | AM: CRAWFORD, FAIRCLOUGH | |
2009-03-18 | NR: AUSTERMAN, KELLY, HAWKER | |
2009-03-18 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, STOLTZE | |
2009-03-18 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 3DP 3NR 2AM | |
2009-02-27 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2009-02-27 | NR: MILLETT, KELLER, HERRON, MUNOZ | |
2009-02-27 | DP: CISSNA, HARRIS | |
2009-02-27 | CRA RPT CS(CRA) 2DP 4NR | |
2009-01-26 | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON | |
2009-01-22 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2009-01-21 | COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM | |
2009-01-20 | CRA, FIN | |
2009-01-20 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-20 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09 |
Subjects
Age Of Persons
Disabilities
Law Enforcement
Marine Facilities
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Property
Public Corporations
Senior Citizens
Taxation
Universities
Veterans
Disabilities
Law Enforcement
Marine Facilities
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Property
Public Corporations
Senior Citizens
Taxation
Universities
Veterans