AK HB1 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - COSPONSOR(S): KURKA
Pending: House Community & Regional Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for audits of CARES Act funds expended for the community assistance program and direct grants to municipalities and communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Audit Of Cares Act Funds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KURKA
2021-03-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): VANCE
2021-03-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
2021-03-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MCCABE
2021-02-18HouseREFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
2021-02-18HouseCRA, FIN
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-02-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback