AK HB1 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to absentee voting, voting, early voting, special needs voting, and voter registration; relating to poll watchers; relating to absentee ballots, questioned ballots, and questioned ballot procedures; relating to which primary election ballot a voter may use; relating to early voting locations at which persons may vote absentee ballots; and relating to qualifications to vote at a municipal election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Registration And Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date Reconsideration (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2017-05-04SenateSTA, JUD
2017-05-04SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-01HouseVERSION: CSHB 1(JUD)(EFD FLD)
2017-05-01HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-01House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2017-05-01HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y22 N18
2017-05-01HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y22 N18
2017-05-01HouseRECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
2017-04-28HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TARR
2017-04-28HouseMILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2017-04-28HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y30 N8 E1 A1
2017-04-28HousePASSED Y22 N17 E1
2017-04-28HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-28HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N23 E1
2017-04-28HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2017-04-28HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 1(JUD)
2017-04-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN, KAWASAKI, GARA
2017-04-27HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
2017-04-27HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-27HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-27HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2017
2017-04-19HouseFN2: ZERO(GOV)
2017-04-19HouseAM: EASTMAN
2017-04-19HouseDP: KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, LEDOUX, CLAMAN
2017-04-19HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP 1AM
2017-03-29HouseFN1: (GOV)
2017-03-29HouseNR: JOHNSON, KNOPP, BIRCH
2017-03-29HouseDP: WOOL, LEDOUX, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-03-29HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 3NR
2017-01-18HouseSTA, JUD
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback