WY SF0025 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; repealing provisions related to ballot labels; making conforming amendments; amending requirements for forms; providing for notification of voter registration information updates and purges; providing for secretary of state directives; removing provisions for segregated temporary registration lists; removing requirement that secretary of state certify that registration system is operational; providing that registration through the federal postcard application is valid for one election cycle; amending certification of names of party nominees; providing conforming amendment for registration period statutes by decreasing deadline for changing party affiliation; amending order of offices listed on ballots; amending requirements for petitions; amending requirements for absentee ballots; amending requirements for delivery and posting of diagrams of voting devices and sample ballots; providing for use of absentee ballots at special elections; removing secretary of state from process for special mail ballot elections; providing for independent candidate review of voting machines; amending privacy requirements for voting booths; amending tabulation and certification of elections to include circuit court judges and special district board members; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Election code-revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-10 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0046 | |
2014-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0046 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0046 |
2014-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0046 | |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed COW |
2014-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-27 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 |
2014-02-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed COW |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-12-16 | Bill Number Assigned |