WY SF0012 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Chapter No. 146 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Chapter No. 146 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; creating the crimes of trespassing to unlawfully collect resource data and unlawful collection of resource data; limiting use of unlawfully collected data; providing for expungement; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Trespassing to collect data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted SF0012JC001: 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted SF0012JC001: 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0012JC001: 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0012JC001: 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted SF0012JC001: 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0012JC001: 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0012JC001: 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Chapter No. 146 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-10 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0061 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0061 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0061 |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0061 | |
2015-03-03 | House | Adopted SF0012JC001: 52-7-1-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Adopted SF0012JC001: 26-4-0-0-0 |
2015-02-26 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 |
2015-02-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-11 | Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-01-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-19 | Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-16 | Bill Number Assigned |