WY SF0010 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 30 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 30 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to government administration; eliminating the position of a director of the department of education; transferring specified duties to the state superintendent in accordance with Powers v. State, 2014 WY 15, 318 P.3d 300 (Wyo. 2014) and Powers v. State, No. 180-673 (1st Jud. Dist. Ct. Apr. 18, 2014); accordingly conforming law; specifying application; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education Administration-1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Chapter No. 30 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-25 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0018 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0018 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0018 |
2015-02-20 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0018 | |
2015-02-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-12 | Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2015-01-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-16 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-14 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-14 | Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-16 | Bill Number Assigned |