WY SF0003 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 174 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 174 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; authorizing provision of certain investigational drugs, biological products and devices by manufacturers; providing for availability and coverage of investigational drugs, biological products and prohibiting actions against licenses of physicians as specified; specifying that no private cause of action against manufacturers and other entities is created; providing definitions; exempting conflicting provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Right to try.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Burns [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Rosie Berger [R] | Rep. Scott Clem [R] |
Rep. David Miller [R] | Rep. John Patton [R] | Rep. Mary Throne [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Chapter No. 174 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0076 | |
2015-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0076 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0076 |
2015-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0076 | |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 |
2015-03-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-03-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-27 | Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2015-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-26 | Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-01 | Bill Number Assigned |