WY SF0106 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming state guard; removing federal involvement in the Wyoming state guard; allowing the governor to organize and maintain the Wyoming state guard; specifying the source of payment for service in the state guard; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming state guard-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 21-10-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 21-10-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | Senate | COW:S Did not consider for COW |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-20 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 21-10-0-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |