WY HB0012 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; clarifying applicability of act; specifying that restitution penalties for game violations include economic values of wildlife; specifying the account restitution penalties for game violations shall be paid to; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game and fish violations-restitutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - Senate - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - Senate - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - COW:Failed 12-18-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-16 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | Senate | COW:Failed 12-18-0-0-0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-05 | Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2015-01-21 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-20 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-16 | Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-12 | Bill Number Assigned |