WY HB0010 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-19 - Chapter No. 3 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-19 - Chapter No. 3 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to post secondary education; authorizing the Wyoming Community College Commission to enter into and administer reciprocity agreements with other states on the licensing of specified post secondary institutions; authorizing admission of post secondary institutions with a physical presence in Wyoming under reciprocity agreement and providing for reciprocal licensure in Wyoming of institutions located in states that are signatories to the agreement; granting rulemaking authority and authorizing fees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education-state authorization reciprocity agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | Chapter No. 3 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-17 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0002 | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0002 |
2015-02-12 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0002 |
2015-02-11 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0002 | |
2015-02-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-09 | Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2015-01-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-27 | Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-20 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-19 | Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-12 | Bill Number Assigned |