WY HB0002 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to special museum districts; specifying the procedure for establishing a special museum district and conducting subsequent district elections; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Museum districts-formation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0- (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0- (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 4-5-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-09 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-01 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0002.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HB0002.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HB0002.pdf |