WV SB618 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-06-09 - Effective Date

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to amend the requirements for licensing of osteopathic physician assistants and the conditions under which osteopathic physician assistant may prescribe drugs, to parallel the requirements and conditions for physician assistants who are supervised by medical doctors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to osteopathic physician assistants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-09 Effective Date
2010-04-22 Chapter 154, Acts, Regular Session, 2010
2010-03-20 Approved by Governor 3/22/10 - Senate Journal
2010-03-22 Approved by Governor 3/22/10
2010-03-20 Approved by Governor 3/22/10 - House Journal
2010-03-20 To Governor 3/19/10 - House Journal
2010-03-19 To Governor 3/19/10 - Senate Journal
2010-03-19 To Governor 3/19/10
2010-03-12 House received Senate message
2010-03-11 Completed legislative action
2010-03-11 Communicated to House
2010-03-11 Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 7)
2010-03-10 Communicated to Senate
2010-03-10 Passed House (Roll No. 238)
2010-03-10 Read 3rd time
2010-03-10 On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2010-03-09 Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-03-09 Read 2nd time
2010-03-09 On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2010-03-08 Read 1st time
2010-03-08 From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar
2010-03-05 2nd reference dispensed
2010-03-05 With amendment, do pass
2010-03-04 To House Health and Human Resources
2010-03-04 To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization
2010-03-04 Introduced in House
2010-03-03 Ordered to House
2010-03-03 Passed Senate (Roll No. 37)
2010-03-03 Read 3rd time
2010-03-03 On 3rd reading
2010-03-02 Read 2nd time
2010-03-02 On 2nd reading
2010-03-01 Read 1st time
2010-03-01 On 1st reading
2010-03-01 Immediate consideration
2010-03-01 Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
2010-02-25 On 2nd reading to Government Organization
2010-02-25 Read 1st time
2010-02-25 On 1st reading
2010-02-25 Immediate consideration
2010-02-25 Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization
2010-02-19 To Health and Human Resources
2010-02-19 To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization
2010-02-19 Introduced in Senate
2010-02-19 To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization
2010-02-19 Filed for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3014A1Amended CodeCitation Text
3014A2Amended CodeCitation Text
3014A3Amended CodeCitation Text
3014A4Amended CodeCitation Text
3014A5Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback