WV SB602 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring health care providers wear ID badges
Title
Requiring health care providers wear ID badges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 294) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 74, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 294) |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2014-02-26 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1C | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 1C | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 1C | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 1C | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 1C | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 1C | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 1C | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |