WV SB553 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to set a reasonable date for independent candidates to file petitions to run in municipal elections and clarify the filing officer.
Title
Relating to certificates of nomination for elected office
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. Rocky Fitzsimmons [D] | Sen. Donald Cookman [D] | Sen. Jack Yost [D] |
Sen. Robert Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 425) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 16) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 16) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 61, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 425) |
2014-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 16) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Unanimous consent to amend |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/24/14 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4491 (Same As) 2014-02-20 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 5 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |