WV SB523 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for additional state veterans skilled nursing facility in Beckley
Title
Providing for additional state veterans skilled nursing facility in Beckley
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 14) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 337) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 337) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/20/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/14 |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 14) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 337) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Laid over on 2nd reading, Daily Calendar, until 3/6 |
2014-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2014-03-03 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2014-02-26 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 12) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2014-02-12 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2014-02-10 | Senate | To Military |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-10 | Senate | To Military then Finance |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1B | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 29A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 29A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 5 | 15g | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22 | 9a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9A | 1 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9A | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |