WV SB477 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/14 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to provide that teachers determine the use of time of a planning period. It also provides a definition of “meeting” for purposes of this section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing teachers determine use of time during planning period

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-08 - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 488) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 59) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Passed House (Roll No. 334) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Passed House (Roll No. 333) (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-14HouseVetoed by Governor 4/1/14 - House Journal
2014-03-14SenateVetoed by Governor 4/1/14 - Senate Journal
2014-04-01SenateVetoed by Governor 4/1/14
2014-03-14HouseTo Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal
2014-03-14SenateTo Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-27SenateTo Governor 3/27/14
2014-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2014-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2014-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-03-08HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 488)
2014-03-08HouseConference report received-House
2014-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2014-03-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2014-03-08SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 59)
2014-03-08SenateConference report filed - Senate
2014-03-08HouseConference report filed - House
2014-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2014-03-08SenateTo conference
2014-03-08SenateCommunicated to House
2014-03-08SenateSenate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Tucker, D. Hall, Boley
2014-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2014-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-03-08HouseHouse appointed conferees: Pethtel, Williams, Sumner
2014-03-08HouseHouse refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
2014-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2014-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2014-03-07SenateSenate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2014-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2014-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-03-07HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 334)
2014-03-07HouseHouse reconsidered passage (Voice)
2014-03-07HouseTitle amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2014-03-07HouseHouse reconsidered its action
2014-03-07HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-03-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 333)
2014-03-07HouseRead 3rd time
2014-03-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-03-06HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2014-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2014-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2014-03-04HouseWith amendment, do pass
2014-02-21HouseTo House Education
2014-02-21HouseTo Education
2014-02-21HouseIntroduced in House
2014-02-21SenateOrdered to House
2014-02-21SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 8)
2014-02-21SenateRead 3rd time
2014-02-21SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-02-21SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2014-02-20SenateRead 2nd time
2014-02-20SenateOn 2nd reading
2014-02-19SenateRead 1st time
2014-02-19SenateOn 1st reading
2014-02-18SenateCommittee substitute reported
2014-02-03SenateTo Education
2014-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate
2014-02-03SenateTo Education
2014-02-03SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4185 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - To House Government Organization

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18A414Amended CodeCitation Text
5A11Amended CodeCitation Text
5A110New CodeSee Bill Text
5A31Amended CodeCitation Text
5A310dNew CodeSee Bill Text
5A310eNew CodeSee Bill Text
5A311Amended CodeCitation Text
5A317Amended CodeCitation Text
5A328Amended CodeCitation Text
5A33Amended CodeCitation Text
5A330Amended CodeCitation Text
5A331Amended CodeCitation Text
5A34Amended CodeCitation Text
5A35Amended CodeCitation Text
5A360New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=477&year=2014&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb477%20intr.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=477
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB477%20SUB1.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=477
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB477%20SUB1%20ENG.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=477
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB477%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=477
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/senate/02-21-0008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/senate/02-14-0003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/house/00333.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/house/00334.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/senate/03-08-0059.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/house/00488.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback