WV SB454 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a framework for computation, payment and reporting of the Motor Fuel Excise Tax on alternative fuels.
Title
Relating to taxation of alternative motor fuels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 76) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 76) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 337) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 336) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 76) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 337) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 336) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 5/3/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 5/1/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Governor 5/1/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Effective ninety days from passage |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 76) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 76) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 337) |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 336) |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2013-04-05 | House | To House Finance |
2013-04-05 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-04-04 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2013-04-04 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Finance |
2013-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2013-03-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2886 (Same As) 2013-03-08 - To House Roads and Transportation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 14C | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 14C | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 14C | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 14C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 14C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 14C | 6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 14C | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15 | 18b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15A | 13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |