WV SB430 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make the Cash Management Improvement Act report an annual report since the calculation is only done annually, and to have the State Treasurer establish standards and reviews for receipting moneys of all state spending units except the Department of Revenue.
Title
Relating to receipting of state moneys
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 407) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 406) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 406) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 407) |
2014-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 406) |
2014-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | To House Finance |
2014-02-25 | House | To Finance |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 9) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2014-01-24 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-24 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1 | 12b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |