WV SB414 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 167, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 167, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Redirecting nonprobate appraisement filings
Title
Redirecting nonprobate appraisement filings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 328) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 327) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 10) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 328) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 327) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 167, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/17/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 10) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 10) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 328) |
2014-03-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 327) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-03-03 | House | To House Finance |
2014-03-03 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2014-02-24 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-24 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 4) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Motion |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4398 (Same As) 2014-02-04 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 11 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44 | 1 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |