WV SB403 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to regulate the importation and possession of certain injurious aquatic species.
Title
Regulating importation and possession of certain injurious aquatic species
Sponsors
Sen. William Laird [D] | Sen. Clark Barnes [R] | Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. Douglas Facemire [D] |
Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] |
Sen. Robert Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 326) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 189, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/18/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/18/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/18/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/17/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 326) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-12 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-01-22 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-22 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4293 (Same As) 2014-02-06 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |