WV SB365 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 4, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 4, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Accepting certain Ethics Acts provisions for elected Conservation District Supervisors
Title
Relating to administration of Conservation Agency programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 54) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 54) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 395) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 394) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 54) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 395) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 394) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 4, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 54) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 54) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 395) |
2014-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 394) |
2014-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-07 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | Placed on Daily Calender |
2014-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2014-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 5) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 2/24/14 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Motion |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported without recommendation |
2014-01-22 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-16 | Senate | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2837 (Same As)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 15 | 8d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15 | 9n | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 21A | 4a | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 10 | 15a | New Code | See Bill Text |
6B | 2 | 5c | Amended Code | Citation Text |