WV SB359 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Removing hand canvassing requirements of electronic voting machines

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing hand canvassing requirements of electronic voting machines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-08 - Effective from passage (Roll No. 393) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Passed House (Roll No. 392) (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Effective from passage (Roll No. 53) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 53) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14SenateChapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
2014-03-14SenateApproved by Governor 3/24/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-24SenateApproved by Governor 3/24/14
2014-03-14HouseApproved by Governor 3/24/14 - House Journal
2014-03-14HouseTo Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal
2014-03-14SenateTo Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-21SenateTo Governor 3/21/14
2014-03-08SenateCompleted legislative action
2014-03-08SenateCommunicated to House
2014-03-08SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 53)
2014-03-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 53)
2014-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2014-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-03-08HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 393)
2014-03-08HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 392)
2014-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2014-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-03-07HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2014-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2014-03-06HouseImmediate consideration
2014-03-06HousePlaced on Daily Calender
2014-02-28HouseFrom Daily Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar
2014-02-28HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-27HouseLaid over on 1st reading, Daily Calendar, until 2/28
2014-02-27HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-26HouseLaid over on 1st reading, Daily Calendar, until 2/27
2014-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-25HouseDo pass
2014-01-29HouseTo House Judiciary
2014-01-29HouseTo Judiciary
2014-01-29HouseIntroduced in House
2014-01-28SenateOrdered to House
2014-01-28SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 8)
2014-01-28SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 8)
2014-01-28SenateRead 3rd time
2014-01-27SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 1/27/14
2014-01-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2014-01-24SenateRead 2nd time
2014-01-24SenateOn 2nd reading
2014-01-23SenateRead 1st time
2014-01-23SenateOn 1st reading
2014-01-22SenateReported do pass
2014-01-16SenateTo Judiciary
2014-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2014-01-16SenateTo Judiciary
2014-01-16SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4198 (Same As) 2014-01-16 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
34A28Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback