WV SB317 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 129, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to create a uniform regulation of firearms, ammunition, and firearm accessories throughout West Virginia solely determined by the Legislature. It states legislative intent; provides definitions; general rules relating to the regulation of firearms, ammunition, and firearm accessories; provides remedies for unlawful regulation; and provides for exceptions. The bill removes references to regulation of firearms by counties and municipalities. And, the bill provides applicability and effective date of the new article.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to municipal firearm laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-08 - Effective from passage (Roll No. 384) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Passed House (Roll No. 383) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Effective from passage (Roll No. 24) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 24) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14SenateChapter 129, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
2014-03-14HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/14 - House Journal
2014-03-14SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/14
2014-03-14HouseTo Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal
2014-03-14SenateTo Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-21SenateTo Governor 3/21/14
2014-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2014-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2014-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-03-08HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 384)
2014-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 383)
2014-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2014-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2014-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2014-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2014-03-05HouseDo pass
2014-02-26HouseTo House Judiciary
2014-02-26HouseTo Judiciary
2014-02-26HouseIntroduced in House
2014-02-25SenateOrdered to House
2014-02-25SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 24)
2014-02-25SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 24)
2014-02-25SenateRead 3rd time
2014-02-25SenatePalumbo Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-02-25SenateDeferred until foot of 2nd reading
2014-02-24SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 2/24/14 with right to amend
2014-02-24SenateDeferred until foot of 1st reading
2014-02-24SenateOn 3rd reading with right to amend
2014-02-21SenateFloor amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2014-02-21SenateFloor amendment reported
2014-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2014-02-21SenateOn 2nd reading
2014-02-20SenateRead 1st time
2014-02-20SenateOn 1st reading
2014-02-19SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2014-02-13SenateTo Judiciary
2014-02-13SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2014-01-10SenateTo Government Organization
2014-01-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2014-01-10SenateTo Government Organization then Judiciary
2014-01-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2760 (Similar To) 2014-01-09 - To House Judiciary
HB4288 (Similar To) 2014-01-24 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
617B1New CodeSee Bill Text
617B2New CodeSee Bill Text
617B3New CodeSee Bill Text
617B4New CodeSee Bill Text
617B5New CodeSee Bill Text
617B6New CodeSee Bill Text
713Amended CodeCitation Text
815aAmended CodeCitation Text
8125Amended CodeCitation Text
8125ARepealed CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=317&year=2014&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb317%20intr.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=317
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB317%20SUB1.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=317
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB317%20SUB2.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=317
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB317%20SUB2%20ENG.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=317
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB317%20SUB2%20ENR.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=317
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/senate/02-25-0024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/house/00383.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/house/00384.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback