WV SB253 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend language in the code for accuracy and clarification concerning the special community-based pilot demonstration project. The bill changes “President of the Community and Technical College System” to “Chancellor of the Community and Technical College System”. It also adds the word “preschool” following the reference to increased enrollment of four-year olds in Section 4.
Title
Clarifying code for Community-Based Pilot Demonstration Project to Improve Outcomes for At-Risk Youth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 47) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 376) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 376) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/20/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 47) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 376) |
2014-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | To House Education |
2014-02-25 | House | To Education |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 2/19/14 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Education |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Education |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Select Committee on Children and Poverty |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Select Committee on Children and Poverty then Education |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 21 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 21 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |