WV SB204 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 31, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 31, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to crime victims compensation awards
Title
Relating to crime victims compensation awards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 76) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 76) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 453) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 452) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 76) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 453) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 452) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 31, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 76) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 76) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 453) |
2014-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 452) |
2014-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2014-03-08 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2014-03-08 | House | Placed at foot of bills on 3rd reading |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-07 | House | Sub. amend. for committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-03-05 | House | To House Finance |
2014-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2014-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 4) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2014-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 15 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
14 | 2A | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
14 | 2A | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
14 | 2A | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
14 | 2A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
14 | 2A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |