WV SB202 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 17, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 17, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Benefit Corporation Act
Title
Creating Benefit Corporation Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 320) (Y: 70 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 319) (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 1) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 319) (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 1) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 17, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/31/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/14 |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 320) |
2014-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 319) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 1) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31F | 1 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31F | 1 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31F | 1 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31F | 2 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31F | 2 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31F | 2 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31F | 3 | 301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31F | 4 | 401 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31F | 4 | 402 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31F | 4 | 403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31F | 5 | 501 | New Code | See Bill Text |