WV SB190 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow the Division of Highways to participate in funding a needed public-private transportation project, to eliminate the sunset provision for comprehensive agreements for public-private partnership projects currently set for June 30, 2013, and to require the division to provide a copy of a comprehensive agreement to the Joint Committee on Government and Finance at least thirty days prior to said agreement being executed by the Commissioner of Highways.
Title
Relating to public-private transportation projects funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 375) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 374) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 233) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 374) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 233) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 169, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/26/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-26 | Senate | To Governor 4/26/13 |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 375) |
2013-04-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 374) |
2013-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Do pass |
2013-04-05 | House | To House Finance |
2013-04-05 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-03-26 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2013-03-26 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Finance |
2013-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 2) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 2) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2013-03-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-02-15 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-15 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2511 (Same As) 2013-02-15 - To House Roads and Transportation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 27 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 27 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 8 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 8 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |