WV HCR36 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 13 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-13 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The "Private First Class Oscar Harper, Sr. Memorial Bridge"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The "U.S. Army Private First Class Oscar Harper, Sr. Memorial Bridge"

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-13SenateCompleted legislative action
2013-04-13SenateCommunicated to House
2013-04-13SenateAdopted by Senate (Voice vote)
2013-04-13SenateImmediate consideration
2013-04-13SenateReported be adopted
2013-03-22SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2013-03-22SenateIntroduced in Senate
2013-03-22SenateHouse Message received
2013-03-21HouseCommunicated to Senate
2013-03-21HouseAdopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote)
2013-03-21HouseReported by the Clerk
2013-03-21HouseFrom House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar
2013-03-20HouseBy substitute, be adopted
2013-02-21HouseTo House Rules
2013-02-21HouseIntroduced in House
2013-02-21HouseTo Rules
2013-02-21HouseFiled for introduction

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback