WV HB4333 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to effect a fifteen percent reduction in all statutory transfers that are made outside of the budget process and redirect those funds to the State Excess Lottery Revenue Fund.
Title
Relating to the redirection of certain Lottery revenues to the State Excess Lottery Revenue Fund
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Tim Armstead [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 71) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 204) (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 162) (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 204) (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 162) (Y: 38 N: 58 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 71) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Snyder Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Prezioso Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Amendment not germane |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Point of Order |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Blair Amendment to committee amendment reported |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd reading |
2014-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Motion to take up for immediate consideration |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 204) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-26 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-25 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 162) |
2014-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-02-24 | House | Recommitted to Finance on 2nd reading |
2014-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2014-01-24 | House | To House Finance |
2014-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-24 | House | To Finance |
2014-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB385 (Same As) 2014-01-20 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22 | 18d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22A | 10d | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22A | 10e | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22A | 10f | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22C | 27a | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 25 | 22b | New Code | See Bill Text |