WV HB4208 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 23, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to control certain drugs, including synthetic hallucinogens, by better conforming the state lists of controlled substances to the federal lists, and by adding language mirroring the federal Controlled Substances Analogue Enforcement Act of 1986 which outlaws analogues to Schedule I controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Banning synthetic hallucinogens

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-08 - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 60) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 478) (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Passed Senate (Roll No. 15) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Passed House (Roll No. 58) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-10HouseChapter 23, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
2014-03-14HouseApproved by Governor 4/1/14 - House Journal
2014-04-01HouseApproved by Governor 4/1/14
2014-03-14SenateApproved by Governor 4/1/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-28HouseTo Governor 3/28/14
2014-03-14HouseTo Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal
2014-03-14SenateTo Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal
2014-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2014-03-08SenateCompleted legislative action
2014-03-08SenateCommunicated to House
2014-03-08SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 60)
2014-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2014-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-03-08HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 478)
2014-03-08HouseConference report received-House
2014-03-08HouseConference report filed - House
2014-03-08SenateConference report filed - Senate
2014-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2014-03-08HouseTo conference
2014-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-03-08HouseHouse appointed conferees: Perdue, Poore, Ellington
2014-03-08HouseHouse agreed to conference
2014-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2014-03-08SenateCommunicated to House
2014-03-08SenateSenate appoints conference committee: Stollings, Cookman, Nohe
2014-03-08SenateSenate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote)
2014-03-08SenateHouse Message received
2014-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-03-08HouseHouse refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice)
2014-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2014-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2014-03-07SenateJudiciary Title amendment adopted
2014-03-07SenateHealth Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2014-03-07SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 15)
2014-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2014-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading
2014-03-06SenateJudiciary Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-03-06SenateHealth Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2014-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2014-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2014-03-05SenateRead 1st time
2014-03-05SenateOn 1st reading
2014-03-04SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2014-02-28SenateTo Judiciary
2014-02-28SenateReported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary
2014-02-13SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2014-02-13SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2014-02-13SenateIntroduced in Senate
2014-02-13SenateHouse Message received
2014-02-12HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-02-12HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-02-12HousePassed House (Roll No. 58)
2014-02-12HouseRead 3rd time
2014-02-12HouseOn 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-11HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2014-02-11HouseRead 2nd time
2014-02-11HouseOn 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-10HouseRead 1st time
2014-02-10HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-07HouseBy substitute, do pass
2014-01-23HouseTo House Judiciary
2014-01-23HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2014-01-17HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2014-01-17HouseIntroduced in House
2014-01-17HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2014-01-17HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60A1101Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2204Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2206Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2208Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2210Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2212Amended CodeCitation Text
60A3308Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4208&year=2014&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4208%20intr.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=4208
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4208%20SUB.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=4208
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4208%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=4208
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4208%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2014&sesstype=RS&i=4208
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/house/00058.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/senate/03-07-0015.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/house/00478.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2014/RS/votes/senate/03-08-0060.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback