WV HB4142 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to update the law governing the practice of environmental health science and public health sanitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the board of sanitarians

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-11 Effective Date
2010-04-22 Chapter 155, Acts, 2010
2010-04-01 Approved by Governor 4/1/10
2010-03-20 Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal
2010-03-20 Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal
2010-03-20 To Governor 3/25/10 - Senate Journal
2010-03-20 To Governor 3/25/10 - House Journal
2010-03-25 To Governor 3/25/10
2010-03-13 Completed legislative action
2010-03-13 House Message received
2010-03-13 Communicated to Senate
2010-03-13 House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 329)
2010-03-13 House received Senate message
2010-03-11 Senate requests House to concur
2010-03-11 Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 27)
2010-03-11 Read 3rd time
2010-03-11 On 3rd reading
2010-03-11 Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-03-11 Read 2nd time
2010-03-11 Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 26)
2010-03-11 On 2nd reading
2010-03-11 Read 1st time
2010-03-11 On 1st reading
2010-03-10 Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2010-02-04 To Government Organization
2010-02-04 To Government Organization
2010-02-04 Introduced in Senate
2010-02-03 Communicated to Senate
2010-02-03 Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-02-03 Passed House (Roll No. 20)
2010-02-03 Read 3rd time
2010-02-03 On 3rd reading, House Calendar
2010-02-02 Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2010-02-02 Read 2nd time
2010-02-02 On 2nd reading, House Calendar
2010-02-01 Read 1st time
2010-02-01 On 1st reading, House Calendar
2010-01-29 Do pass
2010-01-25 To House Judiciary
2010-01-25 Do pass, but first to Judiciary
2010-01-19 To House Government Organization
2010-01-19 Introduced in House
2010-01-19 To Government Organization then Judiciary
2010-01-19 Filed for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30171Amended CodeCitation Text
301710Amended CodeCitation Text
301711Amended CodeCitation Text
301712New CodeSee Bill Text
301713New CodeSee Bill Text
301714New CodeSee Bill Text
301715New CodeSee Bill Text
301716New CodeSee Bill Text
301717New CodeSee Bill Text
301718New CodeSee Bill Text
301719New CodeSee Bill Text
30172Amended CodeCitation Text
301720New CodeSee Bill Text
30173Amended CodeCitation Text
30174Amended CodeCitation Text
30175Amended CodeCitation Text
30176Amended CodeCitation Text
30177Amended CodeCitation Text
30178Amended CodeCitation Text
30179Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback