WV HB4141 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-02-27 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to repeal the statutory provision which authorizes the State Tax Commissioner to issue business licenses for the purpose of selling drug paraphernalia, to void licenses already issued and to prohibit the sales sales on and after July 1, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to licenses to sell paraphernalia for use with controlled substances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-26 - Passed House (Roll No. 178) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2014-02-27SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2014-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2014-02-27SenateHouse Message received
2014-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2014-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 178)
2014-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2014-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-25HouseRead 2nd time
2014-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-24HouseRead 1st time
2014-02-24HouseOn 1st reading, Daily Calendar
2014-02-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2014-02-14HouseTo House Judiciary
2014-02-14HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2014-01-14HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2014-01-14HouseIntroduced in House
2014-01-14HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2014-01-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
47191Amended CodeCitation Text
47192Repealed CodeCitation Text
47193Amended CodeCitation Text
47194Amended CodeCitation Text
47195Amended CodeCitation Text
60A4403aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback