WI SB97 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.115 (8) (jm), 100.52 (title), 100.52 (2) (b), 100.52 (2) (c) and 100.52 (2) (d); and to create 100.52 (6m) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting certain telephone calls using electronically prerecorded messages, rules for requesting a listing in the nonsolicitation directory, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting certain telephone calls using electronically prerecorded messages, rules for requesting a listing in the nonsolicitation directory, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Harsdorf |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb97 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB97.pdf |