WI SB62 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Published 7-6-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Published 7-6-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 344.62 (2), 344.64 (1), 344.64 (2) and 344.65 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: proof of motor vehicle liability insurance.
Title
Proof of motor vehicle liability insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | Published 7-6-2013 |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-5-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 31 |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 7-3-2013 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2013-05-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-14 | House | Representative Kolste added as a cosponsor |
2013-05-14 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2013-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2013-05-08 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Insurance and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2013-04-23 | House | Senator Lassa added as a coauthor |
2013-04-23 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance |
2013-04-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-17-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Housing |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |