WI SB523 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Published 3-4-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Published 3-4-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 253.13 (1m); to renumber and amend 253.13 (4); to amend 253.13 (1), (2) and (3) and 253.13 (4) (title); and to create 253.13 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: tests administered to newborns for congenital disorders. (FE)
Title
Tests administered to newborns for congenital disorders. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Leah Vukmir [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D] |
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] | Sen. David Hansen [D] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
Sen. John Lehman [D] | Sen. Joe Leibham [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Rep. Patricia Strachota [R] |
Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] |
Rep. Jill Billings [D] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Fred Clark [D] | Rep. Eric Genrich [D] |
Rep. Evan Goyke [D] | Rep. Gary Hebl [D] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] |
Rep. Cory Mason [D] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] |
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Mandy Wright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Published 3-4-2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 135 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2014-02-13 | House | Representative Born added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |