WI SB520 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 215.26 (3) and 220.28; to amend 13.92 (4) (c), 13.92 (4) (d), 13.92 (4) (e), 13.92 (4) (f), 35.93 (2) (b) 4., 35.93 (2) (c) 1., 35.93 (3), 35.93 (3) (e) (intro.), 35.93 (3) (e) 1., 186.098 (9m), 186.113 (7), 186.71 (1), 214.75 (4), 214.75 (5) (a), 215.26 (4) (a), 220.285 (1), 227.01 (13) (intro.), 227.11 (2) (intro.) and 227.27 (2); and to create 13.92 (4) (bm), 186.118, 227.01 (13) (yv) and 227.265 of the statutes; Relating to: rule-making procedures and modifying and repealing various rules promulgated by the Department of Financial Institutions. (FE)
Title
Rule-making procedures and modifying and repealing various rules promulgated by the Department of Financial Institutions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 277 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-02-20 | Senate | LRB correction |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | House | Representatives Kolste and Barca added as cosponsors |
2014-02-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2014-02-11 | House | Read |
2014-02-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lasee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |