WI SB516 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 114.136 (2) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: local airports and the process for enacting aerial approach ordinances. (FE)
Title
Local airports and the process for enacting aerial approach ordinances. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Gudex [R] | Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] |
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] |
Rep. John Spiros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 297 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:40 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2014-03-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development and Local Government |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Introduced |