WI SB499 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-25-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-25-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 70.11 (46) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a property tax exemption for a nonprofit youth baseball association. (FE)
Title
Creating a property tax exemption for a nonprofit youth baseball association. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Published 4-25-2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-24-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 380 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-23-2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 93, Noes 0 |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2014-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lazich |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Elections and Urban Affairs |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced |