WI SB448 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-18-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-18-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 77.54 (6); to renumber and amend 77.54 (6r); and to create 77.54 (6) (am) 4., 77.54 (6) (am) 5. and 77.54 (6) (bn) of the statutes; Relating to: the sales and use tax exemption for equipment used in a fertilizer blending, feed milling, or grain drying operation. (FE)
Title
The sales and use tax exemption for equipment used in a fertilizer blending, feed milling, or grain drying operation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Placed at the foot of the 12th on the calendar of 3-11-2014 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Placed at the foot of the 12th on the calendar of 3-11-2014 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Published 4-18-2014 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-17-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 324 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-16-2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 1 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar of 3-18-2014 and take up |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 28, Noes 4 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the 12th on the calendar of 3-11-2014, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 3 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Report of joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions received |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Report of joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions requested |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue and rereferred to committee on Agriculture, Small Business, and Tourism pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Introduced |