WI SB35 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-24 - Published 4-25-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: powers and duties of an electric transmission company and certificates of public convenience and necessity and permits for certain electric generating facilities and high-voltage transmission lines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Powers and duties of an electric transmission company and certificates of public convenience and necessity and permits for certain electric generating facilities and high-voltage transmission lines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-09 - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24SenatePublished 4-25-2013
2013-04-24SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-24-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 10
2013-04-23SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-23-2013
2013-04-12SenateReport correctly enrolled
2013-04-09SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2013-04-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2013-04-09HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2013-04-09HouseRules suspended
2013-04-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2013-04-09HouseRead a second time
2013-04-09HouseRules suspended and taken up
2013-04-09HouseRead
2013-04-09HouseReceived from Senate
2013-04-09SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2013-04-09SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 1
2013-04-09SenateRules suspended
2013-04-09SenateOrdered to a third reading
2013-04-09SenateSenate Amendment 3 adopted
2013-04-09SenateSenate Amendment 2 adopted
2013-04-09SenateRead a second time
2013-04-08SenatePlaced on calendar 4-9-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2013-03-28SenateAvailable for scheduling
2013-03-28SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2013-03-28SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2013-03-28SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2013-03-27SenateExecutive action taken
2013-03-05SenateSenate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Farrow and Shilling
2013-03-04SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Farrow and Shilling
2013-02-27SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Farrow
2013-02-26SenatePublic hearing held
2013-02-20SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications
2013-02-20SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback