WI SB286 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 115.38, 115.385, 118.42 (2), 118.42 (3) (a) (intro.), 118.42 (3) (a) 1., 118.42 (3) (b) and (c) and 118.42 (4) and (5); to renumber 115.28 (12) (title), 118.40 (5), 118.42 (1) (a) to (d) and 118.42 (3) (a) 2. to 5.; to renumber and amend 115.28 (12) (a), 115.28 (12) (ag) (intro.), 115.28 (12) (ag) 1. and 2. and 115.28 (12) (b); to amend 20.255 (1) (e), 20.255 (1) (he), 115.001 (1), 118.125 (4), 118.40 (2r) (b) 1. (intro.), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2., 118.40 (2r) (b) 2m., 118.40 (2r) (b) 4., 118.40 (2r) (bm), 118.40 (2r) (cm), 118.40 (2r) (d) (intro.), 118.40 (3) (e), 118.40 (4) (c), 118.42 (1) (intro.), 118.60 (10) (c), 118.60 (10) (d), 119.04 (1), 119.23 (10) (c), 119.23 (10) (d), 121.006 (2) (d) and 121.02 (1) (o); and to create 115.383 (4), 115.383 (5), 115.39, 118.40 (2r) (d) 3., 118.40 (3) (f), 118.40 (5) (b), 118.42 (1) (am) (intro.) and 1., 118.42 (1) (bm) (intro.) and 1., 118.42 (1) (cm), 118.42 (2m), 118.60 (9m), 119.23 (9m) and 120.12 (26) of the statutes; Relating to: the student information system, a school and school district accountability system, low-performing schools and school districts, and charter school contracts. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The student information system, a school and school district accountability system, low-performing schools and school districts, and charter school contracts. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-18 - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-09SenatePublished 4-9-2014
2014-04-09SenateReport approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 256
2014-04-07SenatePresented to the Governor on 4-7-2014
2014-03-26SenateReport correctly enrolled
2014-03-21SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2014-03-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2014-03-20HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2014-03-20HouseRules suspended
2014-03-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2014-03-20HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2014-03-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2014-03-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke
2014-03-20HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author
2014-03-20HouseRead a second time
2014-03-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:27 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
2014-03-18HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Pope, Clark, Wright and Hesselbein
2014-03-12HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steineke
2014-03-07HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2014-02-18HouseReceived from Senate
2014-02-18SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2014-02-18SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 29, Noes 3
2014-02-18SenateRules suspended
2014-02-18SenateOrdered to a third reading
2014-02-18SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2014-02-18SenateSenate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2014-02-18SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
2014-02-18SenateRead a second time
2014-02-17SenatePlaced on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2014-02-14SenateAvailable for scheduling
2014-02-14SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 1
2014-02-14SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 1
2014-02-14SenateReport introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2014-02-14SenateReport introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2014-02-13SenateExecutive action taken
2014-02-10SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen
2013-12-30SenateFiscal estimate received
2013-09-12SenatePublic hearing held
2013-09-05SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2013-09-05SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback