WI SB270 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.16 (1) (a) and 343.16 (2) (cm) of the statutes; Relating to: motorcycle operator's licenses and rider courses. (FE)
Title
Motorcycle operator's licenses and rider courses. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] |
Rep. Jeff Stone [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] |
Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 371 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 concurred in |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-14-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2013-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-12 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Weatherston |
2013-11-12 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2013-10-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-10-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Introduced |