WI SB269 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-24 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 218.11 (5m) and 218.43 (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: penalties for violation of certain moped dealer and recreational vehicle dealer requirements and providing a penalty.
Title
Penalties for violation of certain moped dealer and recreational vehicle dealer requirements and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Rep. Jeff Stone [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] |
Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 370 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:26 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2013-10-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2013-10-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-10-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Representative Ballweg added as a cosponsor |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Introduced |