WI SB267 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Published 4-3-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Published 4-3-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 6.15 (2) (bm), 6.29 (2) (b), 6.36 (1) (a), 6.36 (2) (a), 6.36 (2) (c), 6.55 (2) (b), 6.55 (2) (c) 1., 6.79 (2) (d), 6.82 (1) (a) and 6.88 (3) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: recording the type of identifying document provided by an elector as proof of residence.
Title
Recording the type of identifying document provided by an elector as proof of residence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Assembly Amendment 2 concurred in (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Refused to table (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Elections and Urban Affairs (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Refused to table (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-10-08 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Elections and Urban Affairs (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Published 4-3-2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-2-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 182 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 2 concurred in, Ayes 17, Noes 16 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 56, Noes 38 |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 56, Noes 39 |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Zamarripa, Berceau, Barca, Pasch and Jorgensen |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2014-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Bernier and Born |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bernier |
2013-10-22 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2013-10-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Passed, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Refused to table , Ayes 15, Noes 18 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Refused to refer to committee on Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 15, Noes 18 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-10-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-09-13 | Senate | Representative Kleefisch added as a cosponsor |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Lazich |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lazich |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Elections and Urban Affairs |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Introduced |