WI SB160 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 49.165 (4) and 165.93 (4); to renumber and amend 968.075 (4); to amend 7.08 (10), 165.85 (4) (b) 1d. a., 950.01, 968.075 (4) (title), 968.075 (8) and 968.075 (9) (a) 2. and (b); and to create 49.165 (4) (b), 165.85 (2) (as), 165.85 (4) (cp), 165.93 (4) (b), 968.075 (4) (a) (intro.), 968.075 (4) (a) 2. and 968.075 (9) (a) 1m. of the statutes; Relating to: training standards for law enforcement officers regarding domestic abuse incidents and complaints, and law enforcement reports following a domestic abuse incident. (FE)
Title
Training standards for law enforcement officers regarding domestic abuse incidents and complaints, and law enforcement reports following a domestic abuse incident. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 323 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:22 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2014-03-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Introduced |