WI AJR50 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-1)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: an advisory referendum on an amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Title
An advisory referendum on an amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up, Ayes 39, Noes 60 |
2013-10-30 | House | Representative Bernard Schaber added as a coauthor |
2013-10-17 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and State Licensing and referred to committee on State Affairs and Government Operations pursuant to Assembly Resolution 19 |
2013-10-14 | House | Representative Clark added as a coauthor |
2013-08-27 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Government Operations and State Licensing |
2013-08-27 | House | Introduced |