WI AJR13 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming May 17, 18, and 19, 2013, Syttende Mai Weekend.
Title
Proclaiming May 17, 18, and 19, 2013, Syttende Mai Weekend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on calendar 5-14-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-03-14 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-03-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr13 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AJR13.pdf |