WI AB89 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Published 3-28-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Published 3-28-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.15 (6) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: the method of reporting election returns by municipalities.
Title
The method of reporting election returns by municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Published 3-28-2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-27-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 155 |
2014-03-26 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 rejected |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lassa |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Wright added as a coauthor |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-10-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-10-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-05-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-03-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bernier |
2013-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2013-03-26 | House | Introduced |