WI AB889 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.285 (1) (c), 20.292 (1) (cm), 36.27 (1) (c) and 38.24 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: providing free tuition and fees for resident students enrolled in technical colleges and University of Wisconsin college campuses and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Providing free tuition and fees for resident students enrolled in technical colleges and University of Wisconsin college campuses and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Dana Wachs [D] | Sen. Melissa Agard [D] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Leon Young [D] |
Sen. Kathleen Vinehout [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-04-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2014-03-26 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab889 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB889.pdf |